OK SB1357 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; increasing number of members on Food Service Advisory Council; specifying certain recommendations. Effective date.
Title
Public health; increasing number of members on Food Service Advisory Council; specifying certain recommendations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/20/2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-06 | House | General Order |
2016-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2016-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 19 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Halligan |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |