OK SB1350 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Shaw
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Shaw
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Capitol buildings; providing for display of the national motto in the capitol building. Effective date.
Title
Capitol buildings; providing for display of the national motto in the capitol building. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Shaw |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEachin (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |