OK SB1348 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sexually transmitted infections; broadening certain testing requirements for pregnant women. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually transmitted infections; broadening certain testing requirements for pregnant women. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
2020-03-09SenateTitle restored
2020-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2020-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author)
2020-02-17SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-17SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateRemove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Simpson
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Smalley
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback