OK SB1347 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; creating the Oklahoma Veterans Facility Investment Act of 2018. Effective date.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; creating the Oklahoma Veterans Facility Investment Act of 2018. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion expired |
2018-04-16 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative West (Josh) |
2018-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 42 |
2018-04-16 | House | Remove Representative Hardin as principal House author and substitute with Representative West (Josh) |
2018-04-16 | House | General Order |
2018-03-26 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |