OK SB1343 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
Pending: House Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Trespassing; private land primarily devoted to farming, ranching or forestry; modifying permissive entities. Effective date.
Title
Trespassing; private land primarily devoted to farming, ranching or forestry; modifying permissive entities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |