OK SB1340 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |