OK SB1339 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act; modifying registration procedures; making plate retention mandatory. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act; modifying registration procedures; making plate retention mandatory. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 16 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment restores bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-26 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2018-04-26 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-26 | House | Amended |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-10 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-10 | House | Title stricken |
2018-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-07 | Senate | coauthored by West (Kevin) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cockroft (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1112 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1112 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |