OK SB1337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Vetoed 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Vetoed 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; modifying acts authorized by distiller's license. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; modifying acts authorized by distiller's license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Vetoed 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 14 |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |