OK SB1337 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; directing the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner to be located near the University of Central Oklahoma Forensic Science Institute; requiring legislative approval for closing any satellite office. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; directing the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner to be located near the University of Central Oklahoma Forensic Science Institute; requiring legislative approval for closing any satellite office. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Marian Cooksey [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Randy Terrill [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 70 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 10; Ayes: 70 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy) | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-28 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-27 | Title restored | |
2010-05-27 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, HC's named Terrill, Miller, Cooksey, Christian, Moore, Morgan, Lamons, Williams | |
2010-04-29 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 21 | |
2010-04-21 | Amended | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-04-08 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey, Moore | |
2010-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-25 | coauthored by Jolley | |
2010-02-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Terrill (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-11 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Terrill | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-03 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 933 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 935 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 936 | New Code | See Bill Text |