OK SB1328 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing Home Care Act; modifying requirement related to administrator of record for multiple facilities. Effective date.
Title
Nursing Home Care Act; modifying requirement related to administrator of record for multiple facilities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |