OK SB1327 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Soldiers and sailors; requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to evaluate the Union Soldiers Home. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Soldiers and sailors; requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to evaluate the Union Soldiers Home. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Veterans and Military Affairs, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by McDugle |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |