OK SB1327 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Waters and water rights; Regional Water Planning Act. Effective date.
Title
Waters and water rights; Regional Water Planning Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named Crain, Branan, Marlatt, Schulz, Burrage, Paddack | |
2012-05-02 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 30; Ayes: 54 Nays: 26 | |
2012-04-26 | Amended | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-11 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | coauthored by Fields | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Richardson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 1086 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 1086 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 1086 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 1086 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 1086 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |