OK SB1321 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle insurance; expanding definition of uninsured motor vehicle; specifying time of payment of certain damages. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle insurance; expanding definition of uninsured motor vehicle; specifying time of payment of certain damages. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseEnacting clause stricken
2018-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-03-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-19SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-15SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0
2018-03-15SenateTitle stricken
2018-03-15SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-02-12SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2018-02-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Quinn
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback