OK SB1318 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Vehicle registration; modifying deadline for registration and temporary license plate removal for certain purchases. Emergency.
Title
Vehicle registration; modifying deadline for registration and temporary license plate removal for certain purchases. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Jech, Rader, Howard, Jett, Simpson, Thompson, Kirt |
2022-05-05 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 6 |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-11 | House | Title stricken |
2022-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jech |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |