OK SB1315 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-01 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-01 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education employees; providing for paid adoption leave; providing for use of accrued sick leave after certain leave is exhausted. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Education employees; providing for paid adoption leave; providing for use of accrued sick leave after certain leave is exhausted. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |