OK SB1314 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; establishing certain reporting requirements. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Central Purchasing Act; establishing certain reporting requirements. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Modernization
2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2018-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author)
2018-02-12SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74855New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback