OK SB131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Fire Marshal; authorizing Fire Marshall to serve as code and variance board for certain trades and industries. Effective date.
Title
State Fire Marshal; authorizing Fire Marshall to serve as code and variance board for certain trades and industries. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/17/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2015-04-13 | House | General Order |
2015-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-02 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |