OK SB1309 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Daylight saving time; adoping daylight saving time as year-round standard time. Effective date.
Title
Daylight saving time; adoping daylight saving time as year-round standard time. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Silk [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Silk |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |