OK SB1309 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - SCs named Burrage, Johnson (Rob), Bingman, Schulz, Ballenger, Brinkley
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Elections; modifying various provisions relating to elections conducted by county election boards. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; modifying various provisions relating to elections conducted by county election boards. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-24 SCs named Burrage, Johnson (Rob), Bingman, Schulz, Ballenger, Brinkley
2012-05-15 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2012-05-09 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-03 HAs read
2012-04-03 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-02 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-02 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 17
2012-04-02 General Order
2012-03-28 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Rules
2012-03-15 First Reading
2012-03-15 Engrossed to House
2012-03-14 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-14 Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-03-14 General Order, Considered
2012-02-27 coauthored by Brinkley
2012-02-27 coauthored by Quinn (principal House author)
2012-02-27 Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Rules
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Burrage
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2613102New CodeSee Bill Text
263101New CodeSee Bill Text
263105New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback