OK SB1309 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; relating to the Oklahoma Development Finance Authority; deleting limitation regarding certain programs. Emergency.
Title
Public finance; relating to the Oklahoma Development Finance Authority; deleting limitation regarding certain programs. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 71 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | To Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-24 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-21 | Title restored | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read | |
2010-05-10 | Conference granted, HC's named Enns, Miller, Proctor, Luttrell, Jackson, Brown, Thompson, Russ | |
2010-05-04 | SCs named Anderson, Bingman, Johnson (Mike), Myers, Gumm | |
2010-05-04 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-04-08 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-08 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | |
2010-03-03 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Enns (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Enns | |
2010-02-04 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Anderson | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 152 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 695 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5062 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |