OK SB1308 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits; creating the Zero Emission Tax Credit Transparency Act of 2016. Effective date.
Title
Income tax credits; creating the Zero Emission Tax Credit Transparency Act of 2016. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Calvey [R] | Sen. Jason Smalley [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Sen. Rob Standridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 23 |
2016-04-21 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-21 | House | Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2016-04-21 | House | General Order |
2016-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-01 | Senate | coauthored by Calvey (principal House author) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Allen |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |