OK SB1304 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Investigative agencies consolidation; directing certain cooperation and sharing of certain information. Effective date.
Title
Investigative agencies consolidation; directing certain cooperation and sharing of certain information. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |