OK SB1301 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing for enforcement of specified provisions related to sales and use tax upon enactment of certain federal law. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing for enforcement of specified provisions related to sales and use tax upon enactment of certain federal law. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Title restored |
2016-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 19 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2016-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Caldwell (principal House author) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 1354 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1354 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1354 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1406 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |