OK SB13 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Remove as coauthor Senator Murdock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion; creating the Abolition of Abortion in Oklahoma Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; creating the Abolition of Abortion in Oklahoma Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Murdock
2019-02-21SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Allen
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2019-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Allen
2019-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Silk
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback