OK SB1298 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Offenders; creating a certification of rehabilitation; stating application requirements. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Offenders; creating a certification of rehabilitation; stating application requirements. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2020-03-03HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-02SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2020-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-02-24SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2020-02-19SenateReferred to Public Safety
2020-02-19SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2020-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author)
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Coleman
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback