OK SB1290 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical care providers; creating the Medical Care Provider Protection Act; modifying definitions and penalties for certain harmful acts; providing for signage. Effective date.
Title
Medical care providers; creating the Medical Care Provider Protection Act; modifying definitions and penalties for certain harmful acts; providing for signage. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 26 |
2020-05-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Taylor |
2020-05-13 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator McCortney |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Coleman |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hall |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Weaver |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |