OK SB1288 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Practice of behavioral health; removing certain limitation on appointees to the State Board of Behavioral Health Licensure. Effective date.
Title
Practice of behavioral health; removing certain limitation on appointees to the State Board of Behavioral Health Licensure. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 17 |
2022-04-26 | House | General Order |
2022-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2022-04-04 | House | Remove Representative Gann as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lepak |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2022-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann (principal House author) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |