OK SB1282 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State Medicaid program; directing specified agencies to study and make certain recommendations. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Medicaid program; directing specified agencies to study and make certain recommendations. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 6
2018-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-02-26SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback