OK SB1281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; modifying various provisions related to Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision and allopathic physicians. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; modifying various provisions related to Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision and allopathic physicians. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2018-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ritze (principal House author) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 495a | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 503 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 518 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |