OK SB1279 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; modifying purpose and guidelines for Local Development Act; requiring certain agreements. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; modifying purpose and guidelines for Local Development Act; requiring certain agreements. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Appropriations |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1279&Session=1800 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB1279%20INT.PDF |