OK SB1278 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Health Services and Long-Term Care, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Controlled dangerous substances; adding certain exception to electronic prescribing requirements. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled dangerous substances; adding certain exception to electronic prescribing requirements. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Health Services and Long-Term Care, Direct to Calendar
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-18SenateEngrossed to House
2020-02-17SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-02-17SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2020-02-17SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2020-02-10SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2020-02-03SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Rader
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback