OK SB1274 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; repealing the Oklahoma Fuel Alcohol Act. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; repealing the Oklahoma Fuel Alcohol Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2020-02-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |