OK SB1272 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Controlled dangerous substances; Access to the central repository; alert providing notification to person authorized to dispense if dispensed within 30 days. Effective date.
Title
Controlled dangerous substances; Access to the central repository; alert providing notification to person authorized to dispense if dispensed within 30 days. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2012-05-14 | SCs named Nichols, Crain, Fields, Sykes, Ivester, Burrage | |
2012-05-09 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-24 | HAs read | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-23 | Amended | |
2012-04-23 | General Order | |
2012-04-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morrissette | |
2012-04-10 | Remove Representative Martin (Scott) as principal House author and substitute with Representative Derby | |
2012-04-10 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Martin (Scott) (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Nichols | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 309D | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 309F | New Code | See Bill Text |