OK SB1271 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Meat consumers; creating the Oklahoma Meat Consumer Protection Act; prohibiting certain misleading or deceptive practices. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Meat consumers; creating the Oklahoma Meat Consumer Protection Act; prohibiting certain misleading or deceptive practices. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2020-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2020-02-27SenateCoauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
2020-02-10SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback