OK SB1270 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Government; re-creating Red River Boundary Commission. Emergency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government; re-creating Red River Boundary Commission. Emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-03-03HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-02SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2020-03-02SenateEmergency clause restored
2020-03-02SenateTitle restored
2020-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2020-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author)
2020-02-19SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateEmergency clause stricken
2020-02-13SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-13SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2020-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Bullard
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback