OK SB1270 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agency budgeting; requiring all state agencies to submit certain justification acording to a certain schedule. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Agency budgeting; requiring all state agencies to submit certain justification acording to a certain schedule. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |