OK SB127 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Emergency removed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Emergency removed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Authority; fee schedule; reimbursement and utilization rate; preauthorization requirements. Effective date.
Title
Health Care Authority; fee schedule; reimbursement and utilization rate; preauthorization requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Emergency removed |
2016-04-07 | House | Title stricken |
2016-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-30 | House | Withdrawn from Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Ayes: 60 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-30 | House | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Newell (principal House author) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |