OK SB1263 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Low-point beer; special event permit. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Low-point beer; special event permit. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 47 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-10 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 163 | 11a | New Code | See Bill Text |