OK SB1262 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bond defeasance; requiring funding of a certain escrow account in an amount sufficient for defeasance of specified bonds within certain time period. Emergency.
Title
Bond defeasance; requiring funding of a certain escrow account in an amount sufficient for defeasance of specified bonds within certain time period. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-12 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |