OK SB1262 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing the State Department of Education to establish certain language immersion pilot program. Effective date.
Title
Schools; directing the State Department of Education to establish certain language immersion pilot program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Coody (Ann) (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 12 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 12 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 12 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 12 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1262&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1262%20INT.PDF |