OK SB126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Industries Board; prohibiting certain license number on certain advertisement.
Title
Construction Industries Board; prohibiting certain license number on certain advertisement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Coleman; authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB126 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)