OK SB126 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Railroads; railroad crossings. Effective date.
Title
Railroads; railroad crossings. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 20 | |
2011-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2011-04-20 | General Order | |
2011-03-29 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |