OK SB1258 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; removing requirement for the State Board of Education to approve use of general fund for capital expenditures. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; removing requirement for the State Board of Education to approve use of general fund for capital expenditures. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |