OK SB1246 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
Pending: House Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-09 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
Pending: House Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
District judges; establishing methods for filling certain vacancies. Effective date.
Title
District judges; establishing methods for filling certain vacancies. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2016-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |