OK SB1241 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Water and water rights; creating the Oklahoma Water Sustainability Act; authorizing studies. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water and water rights; creating the Oklahoma Water Sustainability Act; authorizing studies. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseEnacting clause stricken
2018-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseReferred to Rules
2018-04-03HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
2018-04-03HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-28SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-02-15SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-02-15SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-15SenateReported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
2018-02-15SenateCoauthored by Representative Russ (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8210211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8210212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8210213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8210214Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback