OK SB1227 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Treasurer; modifying certain fee.
Title
State Treasurer; modifying certain fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 67) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 67) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/11/2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 20 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 19; Ayes: 19 Nays: 15 |
2016-04-21 | House | General Order |
2016-04-07 | House | Emergency added |
2016-04-07 | House | Title restored |
2016-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 19 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |