OK SB1224 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special maintenance projects; raising special maintenance project cap. Emergency.
Title
Special maintenance projects; raising special maintenance project cap. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-20 | House | General Order |
2022-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2022-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |