OK SB1222 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - SCs named GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Veterans' treatment programs; authorizing courts to create veterans' treatment programs. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' treatment programs; authorizing courts to create veterans' treatment programs. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 SCs named GCCA
2012-05-08 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
2012-05-07 HAs rejected, conference requested
2012-04-24 HAs read
2012-04-24 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-23 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Hoskin
2012-04-23 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-23 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2012-04-23 Coauthored by Representative(s) Stiles, Inman, Bennett, Roberts (Dustin)
2012-04-23 General Order
2012-04-10 Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough, Sherrer
2012-04-10 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2012-03-14 First Reading
2012-03-14 Engrossed to House
2012-03-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-13 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-03-13 General Order, Amended
2012-03-13 Senate Rule suspended
2012-03-01 coauthored by David
2012-03-01 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-02-23 Referred to Appropriations
2012-02-23 coauthored by Allen, Garrison, Johnson (Constance), Ivester
2012-02-23 coauthored by Hardin (principal House author)
2012-02-23 Title stricken
2012-02-23 Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Simpson
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback