OK SB1215 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Telephone companies; requiring prior notification; requiring telephone line owners provide certain information. Effective Date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telephone companies; requiring prior notification; requiring telephone line owners provide certain information. Effective Date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 20 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2014
2014-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-23HouseTo Senate
2014-05-23HouseMeasure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 5
2014-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2014-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2014-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4
2014-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2014-05-21SenateCCR read
2014-05-16HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Utility and Environmental Regulation
2014-05-08SenateSCs named Stanislawski, Simpson, Dahm, David, Sparks, Burrage
2014-05-07SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-05-07SenateVote reconsidered whereby HAs adopted
2014-05-07SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2014-05-06SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Stanislawski
2014-05-06SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 21
2014-05-06SenateHAs adopted
2014-04-22SenateHAs read
2014-04-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-04-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2014-04-21HouseAmended
2014-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2014-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee
2014-03-12HouseReferred to Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee
2014-03-12HouseWithdrawn from Transportation Committee
2014-03-12HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2014-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2014-02-26SenateEngrossed to House
2014-02-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-02-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2014-02-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-02-11SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2014-02-10Senatecoauthored by Grau (principal House author)
2014-02-04SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2014-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2014-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback