OK SB1212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; allowing certain officials to use state-owned or state-leased vehicles for specified transportation. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; allowing certain officials to use state-owned or state-leased vehicles for specified transportation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |